TX SB1056 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-25 - House passage as amended reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the transfer of certain probate proceedings to the county in which the executor or administrator of a decedent's estate resides.
Title
Relating to the transfer of certain probate proceedings to the county in which the executor or administrator of a decedent's estate resides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - Amended RV#1753 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1701 (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#1710 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - RV#1701 (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Passed as amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Amended |
2017-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | House | Amended |
2017-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-05-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-05-08 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Filed |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts
Probate
Probate--Durable Power of Attorney
Probate--Guardians & Related Trusts