TX SB1054 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-29 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to requirements for a trial in the contest of an election on a proposed constitutional amendment.
Title
Relating to requirements for a trial in the contest of an election on a proposed constitutional amendment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1719 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1692 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#1692 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-29 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-29 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-17 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1719 |
2023-05-16 | House | Passed |
2023-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1692 |
2023-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-05 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-05 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-03 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-03 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-13 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |