TX SB1043 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-18 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to depository boxes for ballots to be voted by mail.
Title
Relating to depository boxes for ballots to be voted by mail.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1385 (Same As) 2021-03-05 - Referred to Elections
HB2373 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Elections
HB2373 (Same As) 2021-03-15 - Referred to Elections
Subjects
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=SB1043 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/SB01043I.htm |