TX SB1033 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Summary
Relating to the purposes and powers of the Temple Health and Bioscience Economic Development District.
Title
Relating to the purposes and powers of the Temple Health and Bioscience Economic Development District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective immediately | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-29 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-28 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-26 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-26 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-26 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-26 | Record vote | |
2009-05-26 | Passed | |
2009-05-26 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-23 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-18 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-15 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-12 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-12 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-12 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-14 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2009-04-14 | Read first time | |
2009-04-02 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Passed | |
2009-04-02 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-02 | Record vote | |
2009-04-02 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-04-02 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-02 | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment | |
2009-04-02 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-03-24 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-23 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-02-20 | Filed | |
2009-02-20 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Same As) 2009-04-27 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Subjects
BONDS
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Health
Health--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
TEMPLE HEALTH & BIOSCIENCES ECON DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT & AUT
TEMPLE, CITY OF
Charitable & Nonprofit Organizations
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Health
Health--General
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
TEMPLE HEALTH & BIOSCIENCES ECON DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT & AUT
TEMPLE, CITY OF