TX SB1032 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-20 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authority for certain state employees to work flexible hours and to work from home or other authorized alternative work sites.
Title
Relating to authority for certain state employees to work flexible hours and to work from home or other authorized alternative work sites.
Sponsors
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] | Rep. Celia Israel [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-25 - House - SB 1032Third Reading House (Y: 77 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-23 - House - SB 1032Third Reading House (Y: 75 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2015-05-23 - House - SB 1032Third Reading House (Y: 75 N: 49 NV: 3 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-20 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-26 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-25 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-25 | Senate | House passage reported |
2015-05-25 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-25 | House | Passed |
2015-05-25 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2015-05-24 | House | Postponed |
2015-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-23 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-05-19 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-05-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-05-15 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-05-15 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-15 | House | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2015-04-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-04-23 | House | Received from the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amended |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
INFORMATION RESOURCES, DEPARTMENT OF
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
TELECOMMUTING
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Employees
TELECOMMUTING