TX SB1020 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - No action taken in committee
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-06 - No action taken in committee
Summary
Relating to abolishing the Texas Youth Commission and the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission and transferring the powers and duties of those agencies to the newly created Texas Juvenile Justice Department and to the functions of the independent ombudsman for the Texas Youth Commission.
Title
Relating to abolishing the Texas Youth Commission and the Texas Juvenile Probation Commission and transferring the powers and duties of those agencies to the newly created Texas Juvenile Justice Department and to the functions of the independent ombudsman for the Texas Youth Commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-06 | No action taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-13 | Referred to Government Organization | |
2009-03-13 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed | |
2009-03-12 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB3689 (Same As) 2009-06-19 - Effective immediately
Subjects
Juvenile Boards & Officers
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
JUVENILE PROBATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset Bills
YOUTH COMMISSION
JUVENILE JUSTICE DEPARTMENT, TEXAS
JUVENILE PROBATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
Sunset Bills
YOUTH COMMISSION