TX SB10 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-25 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation of the Texas Mental Health Care Consortium.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation of the Texas Mental Health Care Consortium.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-02-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-02-19SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-02-12SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-02-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-12SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-02-05SenateFiled
2019-02-05SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB1448 (Same As) 2019-02-06 - Filed

Subjects

BAYLOR COLLEGE OF MEDICINE
Courts
Courts--Judges
CRIMINAL APPEALS, COURT OF
DELL MEDICAL SCHOOL AT THE UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS AT AUSTIN
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
MENTAL HEALTH CARE CONSORTIUM, TEXAS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions--Newly Proposed
SUPREME COURT
TELEMEDICINE
TEXAS A&M UNIVERSITY SYSTEM HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER
TEXAS TECH UNIVERSITY HEALTH SCIENCES CENTER AT EL PASO
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT FT. WORTH
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT HOUSTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT SAN ANTONIO
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS HEALTH SCIENCE CENTER AT TYLER
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS MEDICAL BRANCH AT GALVESTON
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS RIO GRANDE VALLEY SCHOOL OF MEDICINE
UNIVERSITY OF TEXAS SOUTHWESTERN MEDICAL CENTER

Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback