TX HR963 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Cory Hays for contributing to the Schreiner University victory at the 2018 ACUI Clay Target Collegiate Championships.
Title
Congratulating Cory Hays for contributing to the Schreiner University victory at the 2018 ACUI Clay Target Collegiate Championships.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-12 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-12 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-04-12 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-22 | House | Filed |