TX HR909 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Tony Evans Jr. of Lancaster.
Title
In memory of Tony Evans Jr. of Lancaster.
Sponsors
Rep. Carl Sherman [D] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-08 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-29 | House | Filed |