TX HR905 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 10, 2019, as House District 102 Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing April 10, 2019, as House District 102 Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-04-10 | House | Adopted |
2019-04-10 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-03-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
HOUSE DISTRICT 102 DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates