TX HR884 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 21, 2017, as Tarleton State University Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 21, 2017, as Tarleton State University Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-21 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-21 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-03-15 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TARLETON STATE UNIVERSITY DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
TARLETON STATE UNIVERSITY DAY