TX HR871 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Bessie Reed of Fort Worth, who was born on December 19, 1900.
Title
Honoring Bessie Reed of Fort Worth, who was born on December 19, 1900.
Sponsors
Rep. Marc Veasey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-26 | Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-17 | Filed |