TX HR859 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Pete Kauffman of Georgetown on his 90th birthday.
Title
Congratulating Pete Kauffman of Georgetown on his 90th birthday.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-31 | Adopted | |
2011-03-31 | Laid before the House | |
2011-03-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-03-29 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-03-15 | Filed |