TX HR814 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Corina Ruiz for her service as principal of O'Donnell Intermediate School in the Fabens Independent School District.
Title
Commending Corina Ruiz for her service as principal of O'Donnell Intermediate School in the Fabens Independent School District.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-28 | House | Filed |