TX HR814 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Everett "Ebbie" Brown Neptune, Jr., the longtime athletic director for the Eanes Independent School District and Westlake High School.
Title
In memory of Everett "Ebbie" Brown Neptune, Jr., the longtime athletic director for the Eanes Independent School District and Westlake High School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-20 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-20 | House | Laid before the House |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2013-03-18 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-03-11 | House | Filed |