TX HR810 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-31 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring U.S. Navy Lieutenant Neil Bryan Fletcher for his outstanding service to this nation.
Title
Honoring U.S. Navy Lieutenant Neil Bryan Fletcher for his outstanding service to this nation.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Eissler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-26 | Adopted | |
2009-03-26 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-26 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-24 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-03-16 | Filed |