TX HR808 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-05 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 3, 2015, as the Day of Innocence and honoring Sabrina Butler, Gary Drinkard, and Shujaa Graham for their efforts to effect reforms in the criminal justice system.
Title
Recognizing March 3, 2015, as the Day of Innocence and honoring Sabrina Butler, Gary Drinkard, and Shujaa Graham for their efforts to effect reforms in the criminal justice system.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-05 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-03 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-03 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-03-02 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BUTLER, SABRINA
DAY OF INNOCENCE
DRINKARD, GARY
GRAHAM, SHUJAA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
DAY OF INNOCENCE
DRINKARD, GARY
GRAHAM, SHUJAA
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates