TX HR8 | 2023 | 88th Legislature 3rd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on November 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-02 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Hector A. Sanchez of the U.S. Marine Corps on his promotion to the rank of Sergeant Major.
Title
Congratulating Hector A. Sanchez of the U.S. Marine Corps on his promotion to the rank of Sergeant Major.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-02 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-11-01 | House | Adopted |
2023-11-01 | House | Rules suspended |
2023-10-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-10-06 | House | Filed |