TX HR799 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-06 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Breckenridge Village of Tyler on the occasion of its 25th anniversary on April 4, 2023.
Title
Honoring Breckenridge Village of Tyler on the occasion of its 25th anniversary on April 4, 2023.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-27 | House | Filed |