TX HR782 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Reagan Fuller on being named the 2021 Teacher of the Year at Reed Elementary School in Allen ISD.
Title
Congratulating Reagan Fuller on being named the 2021 Teacher of the Year at Reed Elementary School in Allen ISD.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Leach [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-30 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-21 | House | Filed |