TX HR699 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Liquefied Natural Gas (LNG) Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 25, 2015, as Liquefied Natural Gas (LNG) Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Rep. Rafael Anchia [D] | Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] |
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] | Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-25 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-25 | House | Rules suspended |
2015-02-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
LIQUEFIED NATURAL GAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates