TX HR665 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Justin Fowler for being named Firefighter of the Year of the Burnet Fire Department by the Hill Country 100 Club.
Title
Congratulating Justin Fowler for being named Firefighter of the Year of the Burnet Fire Department by the Hill Country 100 Club.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-23 | House | Filed |