TX HR665 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring the cadets of the Junior ROTC program at John F. Kennedy High School in San Antonio for their achievements and contributions to their community.
Title
Honoring the cadets of the Junior ROTC program at John F. Kennedy High School in San Antonio for their achievements and contributions to their community.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-12 | Adopted | |
2009-03-12 | Laid before the House | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-03-02 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-26 | Filed |