TX HR664 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Sam Houston Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 3, 2011, as Sam Houston Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-15 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-03 | Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-28 | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SAM HOUSTON DAY
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SAM HOUSTON DAY