TX HR66 | 2017 | 85th Legislature 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending the City of Harlingen and Harlingen CISD for funding all-inclusive playgrounds at Pendleton and Victor Parks.
Title
Commending the City of Harlingen and Harlingen CISD for funding all-inclusive playgrounds at Pendleton and Victor Parks.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-08-15 | House | Adopted |
2017-08-15 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-08-15 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-08-14 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-07-24 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-07-24 | House | Filed |