TX HR657 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 4, 2013, as Texas Young Republican Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 4, 2013, as Texas Young Republican Legislative Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-03-04 | House | Adopted |
2013-03-04 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
YOUNG REPUBLICAN LEGISLATIVE DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
YOUNG REPUBLICAN LEGISLATIVE DAY, TEXAS