TX HR651 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Dr. Denise M. Trauth on her retirement as president of Texas State University.
Title
Congratulating Dr. Denise M. Trauth on her retirement as president of Texas State University.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-30 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-30 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-30 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-28 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-22 | House | Filed |