TX HR650 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Sergeant William Karl Keesee of the Texas Department of Public Safety.
Title
In memory of Sergeant William Karl Keesee of the Texas Department of Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Lang [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-09 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-09 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-09 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-24 | House | Filed |