TX HR600 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing March 6, 2017, as Texas Social Work Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing March 6, 2017, as Texas Social Work Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-02 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SOCIAL WORK DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
SOCIAL WORK DAY, TEXAS