TX HR60 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-01 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 2016 Oak Cliff Coalition for the Arts Cinco de Mayo parade and street festival.
Title
Commemorating the 2016 Oak Cliff Coalition for the Arts Cinco de Mayo parade and street festival.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-01 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-02-19 | House | Adopted |
2015-02-19 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-02-19 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2014-12-04 | House | Filed |