TX HR597 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring the Texas Christian University student body and the TCU Student Government Association.
Title
Honoring the Texas Christian University student body and the TCU Student Government Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-03-05 | House | Adopted |
2015-03-05 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-03-05 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-03-02 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-02-19 | House | Filed |