TX HR594 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating the Lake Travis High School volleyball team on winning the UIL 4A state championship for 2010.
Title
Congratulating the Lake Travis High School volleyball team on winning the UIL 4A state championship for 2010.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-10 | Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-02-24 | Filed |