TX HR560 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Ann Williams, founder of the Dallas Black Dance Theatre, for her contributions to dance and dance education.
Title
Commending Ann Williams, founder of the Dallas Black Dance Theatre, for her contributions to dance and dance education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-03-02 | House | Adopted |
2017-03-02 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-28 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-02-21 | House | Filed |