TX HR541 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Andrew and Michelle Mitcham for helping their neighbors in Jersey Village during Winter Storm Uri.
Title
Commending Andrew and Michelle Mitcham for helping their neighbors in Jersey Village during Winter Storm Uri.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2021-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2021-04-05 | House | Filed |