TX HR540 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 26, 2019, as Grammy Texas Music Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 26, 2019, as Grammy Texas Music Advocacy Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-02-26 | House | Adopted |
2019-02-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2019-02-21 | House | Filed |
Subjects
GRAMMY TEXAS MUSIC ADVOCACY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates