TX HR540 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-28 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Sarah Elizabeth Russell on earning the Stars and Stripes Award from American Heritage Girls.
Title
Congratulating Sarah Elizabeth Russell on earning the Stars and Stripes Award from American Heritage Girls.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-02-27 | House | Adopted |
2013-02-27 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2013-02-20 | House | Filed |