TX HR532 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-24 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Lions Club Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 23, 2011, as Lions Club Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
Rep. Ken Legler [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-23 | Adopted | |
2011-02-23 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-21 | Filed |
Subjects
LIONS CLUB DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates