TX HR53 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-27 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing January 24, 2017, as Texas Juvenile Justice Professional Day.
Title
Recognizing January 24, 2017, as Texas Juvenile Justice Professional Day.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-02-23 | House | Adopted |
2017-02-23 | House | Laid before the House |
2017-02-23 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2017-02-21 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2017-01-11 | House | Filed |
Subjects
JUVENILE JUSTICE PROFESSIONAL DAY, TEXAS
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates