TX HR514 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulating Natalie Stephenson on her retirement from the Girl Scouts of Texas Oklahoma Plains.
Title
Congratulating Natalie Stephenson on her retirement from the Girl Scouts of Texas Oklahoma Plains.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |