TX HR513 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorating the 109th anniversary of the birth of Ronald Reagan.
Title
Commemorating the 109th anniversary of the birth of Ronald Reagan.
Sponsors
Rep. Four Price [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-15 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-03-13 | House | Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2019-03-12 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2019-02-20 | House | Filed |