TX HR454 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Recognizing the holy month of Ramadan 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing the holy month of Ramadan 2021.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-01HouseAdopted
2021-04-01HouseLaid before the House
2021-04-01HousePlaced on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar
2021-03-30HouseConsidered in Resolutions Calendars
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Resolutions Calendars
2021-03-25HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback