TX HR434 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-17 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Chambers County Day at the State Capitol.
Title
Recognizing February 16, 2011, as Chambers County Day at the State Capitol.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-17 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-02-16 | Adopted | |
2011-02-16 | Rules suspended | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |
Subjects
CHAMBERS COUNTY DAY
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Congratulatory & Honorary
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates