TX HR431 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
In memory of Harrison M. "Harry" Sewell of Mesquite.
Title
In memory of Harrison M. "Harry" Sewell of Mesquite.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Flynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-03-03 | Adopted | |
2011-03-03 | Laid before the House | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2011-02-15 | Filed |