TX HR421 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-18 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., for its dedicated service to the community and outstanding record of achievements.
Title
Honoring Delta Sigma Theta Sorority, Inc., for its dedicated service to the community and outstanding record of achievements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-03-16 | Adopted | |
2009-03-16 | Rules suspended | |
2009-02-19 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |