TX HR290 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-16 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Honoring Archie, Peyton, and Eli Manning for their NFL careers and their civic engagement.
Title
Honoring Archie, Peyton, and Eli Manning for their NFL careers and their civic engagement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - Adopted RV#45 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-16 | House | Reported enrolled |
2023-03-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-08 | House | Record vote RV#45 |
2023-03-08 | House | Adopted |
2023-03-08 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2023-03-06 | House | Considered in Resolutions Calendars |
2023-03-01 | House | Referred to Resolutions Calendars |
2023-02-21 | House | Filed |