TX HR2597 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Howard E. Jefferson of Houston for his contributions to his fellow citizens.
Title
Honoring Howard E. Jefferson of Houston for his contributions to his fellow citizens.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Filed |