TX HR2594 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring Sister Stella Mae Nash for her service to the Houston community.
Title
Honoring Sister Stella Mae Nash for her service to the Houston community.
Sponsors
Rep. Al Edwards [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-31 | Adopted | |
2009-05-31 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-31 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-29 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-27 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Filed |