TX HR253 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-26 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing November 2021 as Ukrainian Genocide Remembrance Month.
Title
Recognizing November 2021 as Ukrainian Genocide Remembrance Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Tan Parker [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Adopted RV#1542 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1542 |
2021-05-26 | House | Adopted |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid before the House |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Resolutions Calendar |
2021-05-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-08 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-08 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
UKRAINIAN GENOCIDE REMEMBRANCE MONTH
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
UKRAINIAN GENOCIDE REMEMBRANCE MONTH