TX HR249 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Reported enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing February 2-8, 2016, as Chicano History Week.
Title
Recognizing February 2-8, 2016, as Chicano History Week.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-04-16 | House | Adopted |
2015-04-16 | House | Laid before the House |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar |
2015-04-13 | House | Considered in Rules and Resolutions |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules & Resolutions |
2015-01-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHICANO HISTORY WEEK
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Special Dates