TX HR2469 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-31 - Reported enrolled
Summary
Honoring U.S. Army Captain Robert Clayton Hinchman of Angleton for his service to his country.
Title
Honoring U.S. Army Captain Robert Clayton Hinchman of Angleton for his service to his country.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-31 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | Adopted | |
2009-05-28 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-28 | Placed on Congrat. & Memorial Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-27 | Considered in Rules and Resolutions | |
2009-05-25 | Referred to Rules & Resolutions | |
2009-05-22 | Filed |